Creek v. Weber et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Sheldon Creek
Defendant: Douglas Weber and Dennis Kaemingk
Case Number: 4:2017cv04159
Filed: November 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; adopting 16 Report and Recommendation; overruling 17 Objection to Report and Recommendation.; overruling 18 Motion ; denying as moot 19 Motion. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/31/18. (DJP)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Creek will make an initial partial payment of $10.89 by January 26, 2018. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, the case will be dismissed. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/27/17. (DJP)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Clerk to mail PTAR to Plaintiff. Failure to file the PTAR by January 17, 2018, will result in dismissal without prejudice of the complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/19/17. (DJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creek v. Weber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Sheldon Creek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Kaemingk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?