Walker v. Krebs et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Walker
Defendant: Shantel Krebs, Marty Jackley and Kea Warne
Case Number: 4:2018cv04015
Filed: January 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and denying 90 MOTION to Extend Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/3/2020. (SLT) Modified on 9/3/2020 delivered to Clayton Walker via USPS (SLT).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 78 Motion for Clarification; denying 79 Motion for Oral Argument; denying 80 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; granting 81 Motion for Copy of Docket Sheet; and granting 84 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/1/2020. (CLR) Modified on 7/1/2020 delivered to Plaintiff with copy of Docket Sheet via USPS (CLR).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER RE 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/29/19. Mailed copy to Plaintiff 3/29/19. (DJP)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 5 Motion for Hearing; granting 6 Motion for Service; denying 7 Motion for Hearing. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/9/18. (SLW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Krebs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantel Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Jackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kea Warne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?