Hillestad v. McCook County et al
Plaintiff: Dylan Hillestad
Defendant: Mark Norris and McCook County
Case Number: 4:2018cv04093
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by McCook County, Mark Norris. (Marso, Lisa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED filed by Dylan Hillestad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hillestad FLSA Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - Soole FLSA Consent Form) (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/31/18. (SLW)
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by McCook County, Mark Norris. (Marso, Lisa)
August 31, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Hansen Marso on behalf of McCook County, Mark Norris. (Marso, Lisa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Dylan Hillestad. (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Dylan Hillestad. (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 REDACTED DOCUMENT re #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dylan Hillestad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FLSA Consent Form - Redacted) (Pochop, Stephanie) Modified text on 8/16/2018 (SST).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David E. Schlesinger for Dylan Hillestad. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/13/18. (JLS)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney David E. Schlesinger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2850143) by Dylan Hillestad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. General Admission MN Bar Schlesinger) (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew A. Frank for Dylan Hillestad. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/06/2018. (MWT)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew H. Morgan for Dylan Hillestad. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/06/2018. (MWT)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lucas J. Kaster for Dylan Hillestad. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/07/18. (MWT)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Matthew A. Frank to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2845350) by Dylan Hillestad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. General Admission MN Bar Frank) (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Matthew H. Morgan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2845339) by Dylan Hillestad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. General Admission MN Bar Morgan) (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Lucas J. Kaster to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2845330) by Dylan Hillestad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. General Admission MN Bar Kaster) (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McCook County, Mark Norris. 2 original summons, 1 A085, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 McCook County Summons, #2 Norris Summons, #3 AO85 Form)(JLS)
August 3, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Dylan Hillestad. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #0869-2843324. (JLS)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dylan Hillestad in shell case on 8/3/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FSLA Plaintiff's Consent Form) (JLS) Modified restriction on 8/16/2018 to attachment per email from counsel and redacted copy filed at doc. #12 (SAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillestad v. McCook County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Norris
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCook County
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Hillestad
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Represented By: Lucas J. Kaster
Represented By: David E. Schlesinger
Represented By: Matthew H. Morgan
Represented By: Matthew A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?