Omega Liner Company, Inc. v. The Monte Vista Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Omega Liner Company, Inc.
Defendant: The Monte Vista Group, LLC, Rene Quitter and Richard Montemarano
Case Number: 4:2018cv04105
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: South Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kyle E. Hart. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/2/18. (DJP)
October 2, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan R. Sellers. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/2/18. (DJP)
October 1, 2018 20 MOTION for Attorney NATHAN R. SELLERS to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870793) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified to update receipt info, paid in doc 6 on 10/1/2018 (JLS).
October 1, 2018 19 MOTION for Attorney KYLE E. HART to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870785) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified to update receipt info, paid in doc 5 on 10/1/2018 (JLS).
October 1, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hoier, Adam)
September 28, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael T. Lane for Richard Montemarano,Michael T. Lane for Rene Quitter,Michael T. Lane for The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/28/18. (SLW)
September 28, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David M. Kohn for Richard Montemarano,David M. Kohn for Rene Quitter,David M. Kohn for The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/28/18. (SLW)
September 28, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kent M. Walker for Richard Montemarano,Kent M. Walker for Rene Quitter,Kent M. Walker for The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/28/18. (SLW)
September 28, 2018 15 MOTION for Attorney David M. Kohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2886173) by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander)
September 28, 2018 14 MOTION for Attorney Michael T. Lane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2886170) by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander)
September 28, 2018 13 MOTION for Attorney Kent M. Walker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2886167) by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander)
September 21, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Shattuck on behalf of Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
September 19, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/19/18. (DJP)
September 14, 2018 10 PROPOSED ORDER by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC re #8 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines CORRECTED (Morehead, Sander)
September 13, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sander J. Morehead on behalf of Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander)
September 13, 2018 8 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morehead, Sander)
September 13, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. The Monte Vista Group, LLC waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Hoier, Adam)
September 7, 2018 6 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney NATHAN R. SELLERS to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870793) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (JLS).
September 7, 2018 5 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney KYLE E. HART to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870785) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (JLS).
August 23, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Three electronic summons, one A085 form, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 The Monte Vista Group, LLC Summons, #2 Richard Montemarano Summons, #3 Rene Quitter Summons, #4 AO85)(DJP)
August 23, 2018 3 Filing Fee Received from Omega Liner Company, Inc.. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #0869-2859752. (DJP)
August 23, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP)
August 23, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Omega Liner Company, Inc. in shell case on 8/23/18. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omega Liner Company, Inc. v. The Monte Vista Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Monte Vista Group, LLC
Represented By: Sander J. Morehead
Represented By: David M. Kohn
Represented By: Kent M. Walker
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Represented By: Michael T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Quitter
Represented By: Sander J. Morehead
Represented By: David M. Kohn
Represented By: Kent M. Walker
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Represented By: Michael T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Montemarano
Represented By: Sander J. Morehead
Represented By: David M. Kohn
Represented By: Kent M. Walker
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Represented By: Michael T. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omega Liner Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adam R. Hoier
Represented By: Kyle E. Hart
Represented By: Nathan R. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?