Bijaoui v. CA Department of Social Services et al
Plaintiff: Nadia Judith Bijaoui
Defendant: York Risk Services Group, CA Department of Social Services and Wellcomp Managed Care
Case Number: 4:2018cv04110
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Nadia Judith Bijaoui re #1 Complaint. (DJP)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #4 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. Plaintiff shall file the April 2017 stipulation agreement as an addendum to her complaint no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/10/2018. (MWT) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (SLW).
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Nadia Bijaoui. (SLW)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Nadia Judith Bijaoui will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (SLW)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nadia Judith Bijaoui. (SLW)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nadia Judith Bijaoui. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bijaoui v. CA Department of Social Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Risk Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellcomp Managed Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Judith Bijaoui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?