Hyde v. Franklin American Mortgage Company

Plaintiff: Brady Hyde
Defendant: Franklin American Mortgage Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv04113
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2019 Motions due by 5/1/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/1/2018. (SLT) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/2/2018) (SLT).
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 Discovery Report re #8 Order for Discovery Report by Brady Hyde. Related document: #8 Order for Discovery Report.(Nichols, Shawn)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/3/18. (SLW)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Franklin American Mortgage Company. (Mann, Benjamin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Franklin American Mortgage Company on 09-19-18 (Nichols, Shawn)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 REDACTED DOCUMENT Complaint with Exhibits A and B by Brady Hyde. Redacted version of previously filed document #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit automatic payment enrollment, #2 Exhibit Franklin Letter and copy of check) (Nichols, Shawn)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 Filing Fee Received from Brady Hyde. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048010. (JLS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Franklin American Mortgage Company. 1 original summons, 2 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (JLS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brady Hyde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ACH Email, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Franklin American Mortgage Company to Hyde dated 9-6-18) (JLS) Modified security on exhibit B pursuant to e-government act on 9/19/2018 (JLS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyde v. Franklin American Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Hyde
Represented By: Shawn M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin American Mortgage Company
Represented By: Benjamin J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?