Cournoyer v. Fischer et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Cournoyer
Defendant: Undetermined Number of John Does, Eli Kuhlman and Weston Fischer
Case Number: 4:2018cv04114
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order by Eli Kuhlman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Thimsen, Gary)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/1/2019; Motions due by 6/3/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/06/2018. (LH)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Raymond Cournoyer.(Hinrichs, John)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/16/2018. (LH)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Weston Fischer. (Anderson, Robert)
October 8, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eli Kuhlman. (Thimsen, Gary)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Raymond Cournoyer. (Hinrichs, John)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Raymond Cournoyer. (Hinrichs, John)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Weston Fischer. (Anderson, Robert)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Weston Fischer, Eli Kuhlman. Two summons delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. AO85 form and Rule 73 Memo previously provided to Plaintiff's counsel via email. (Attachments: #1 Kuhlman Summons)(DJP)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Raymond Cournoyer as to Eli Kuhlman. (Hinrichs, John) Modified on 9/20/2018 (DJP).
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Raymond Cournoyer as to Weston Fischer. (Hinrichs, John) Modified on 9/20/2018 (DJP).
September 14, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Raymond Cournoyer. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2876033. (JLS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Raymond Cournoyer in shell case on 9/14/18. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cournoyer v. Fischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Undetermined Number of John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Kuhlman
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Fischer
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Cournoyer
Represented By: John R. Hinrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?