First Bank & Trust v. Complete Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: First Bank & Trust
Defendant: James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor and Complete Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04123
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Affidavit of David J. Jencks filed by First Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Receipt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Receipt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Receipt) (Jencks, David)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 Discovery Report (Rule 26(f) Report) by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor.(Tronnes, Benjamin)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Receipt) (Jencks, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Elizabeth Conner in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 10/22/2018 (SAC).
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conner Guarantee, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5/11/17 Correspondence from DB Squared to Def, #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/11/17 Email from Firstline to Def, #5 Exhibit 5 - Addendum Purchase/Sale Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 - Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email string between attorneys, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Attorney Tronnes to Attorney Jencks, #10 Exhibit 10 - Email from Attorney Jencks to Attorney Tronnes) (Tronnes, Benjamin)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor. (Tronnes, Benjamin)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel from Judge Piersol)(JLS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Complete Communications, Inc.. (Tronnes, Benjamin)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin)
September 24, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2883163. (SLW)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor from Minnehaha County, case number 49CIV18-002622. Filed in shell case on 9/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Minnehaha County Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Minnehaha County Complaint)(SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Bank & Trust v. Complete Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bank & Trust
Represented By: David J. Jencks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Garrett Connor
Represented By: Benjamin D. Tronnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Beth Connor
Represented By: Benjamin D. Tronnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Tronnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?