Pickner v. Arnold et al
Plaintiff: Mckenzy Pickner
Defendant: Office of Executive Management and Aaron N. Arnold
Case Number: 4:2018cv04129
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Office of Executive Management on Patricia Archer (Abdallah, Scott)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Office of Executive Management on Baily Schmidt (Abdallah, Scott)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Aaron N. Arnold on Aaron Arnold (Abdallah, Scott)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mckenzy Pickner. (Show, Sara)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mckenzy Pickner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from SD BHR...7-10-18)) (Show, Sara)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aaron N. Arnold, Office of Executive Management. (Bell, Justin)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Aaron N. Arnold, Office of Executive Management. (Bell, Justin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Bell on behalf of All Defendants. (Bell, Justin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of All Defendants. (Anderson, Robert)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #6 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Anderson, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Bell on behalf of All Defendants. (Bell, Justin) Modified on 10/22/2018 to add text(KLE).
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of All Defendants. (Anderson, Robert) Modified on 10/22/2018 to add text (KLE).
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aaron N. Arnold, Office of Executive Management. Three original summons, four A085 forms, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (DJP)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Filing Fee Received from Mckenzy Pickner. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #512263. (JLS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mckenzy Pickner. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - 7/10/18 ltr from BHR to Abdallah) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickner v. Arnold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Executive Management
Represented By: Justin L. Bell
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron N. Arnold
Represented By: Justin L. Bell
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mckenzy Pickner
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?