Expansion Capital Group, LLC v. Patterson

Plaintiff: Expansion Capital Group, LLC
Defendant: Matt Patterson
Case Number: 4:2018cv04135
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: South Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian M. Grossman. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/11/2018. (LH)
December 10, 2018 14 MOTION for Attorney Brian M. Grossman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2937961) by Matt Patterson. (Krystosek, Samuel)
December 3, 2018 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Expansion Capital Group, LLC (Fritz, Daniel)
November 26, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/26/2018. (LH)
November 19, 2018 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Matt Patterson. (Krystosek, Samuel)
November 9, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel A. Krystosek on behalf of Matt Patterson. (Krystosek, Samuel)
November 9, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent R. Cutler on behalf of Matt Patterson. (Cutler, Kent)
November 6, 2018 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Jane Patterson on 10/27/18, filed by Expansion Capital Group, LLC. (Fritz, Daniel)
October 29, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel R. Mentz. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/29/2018. (LH)
October 29, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Petrie. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/29/2018. (LH)
October 18, 2018 5 MOTION for Attorney Rachel Mentz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2900711) by Expansion Capital Group, LLC. (Fritz, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 4 MOTION for Attorney Andrew Petrie to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2900703) by Expansion Capital Group, LLC. (Fritz, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Matt Patterson. 1 original summons, A085 form, and Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Matt Patterson, #2 AO85 form)(JLS)
October 18, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Expansion Capital Group, LLC. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2900515. (JLS)
October 18, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS)
October 18, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Expansion Capital Group, LLC in shell case on 10/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- FTC Final Judgment, #2 Exhibit B- Kirkcaldy ECG Consulting Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- Unbent Capital Sheet, #4 Exhibit D- Second Amended, #5 Exhibit E- Third Amended Operating Agreement, #6 Exhibit F- Fourth Amended Operating Agreement) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Expansion Capital Group, LLC v. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Patterson
Represented By: Kent R. Cutler
Represented By: Brian M. Grossman
Represented By: Samuel A. Krystosek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expansion Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Fritz, II
Represented By: Rachel R. Mentz
Represented By: Andrew J. Petrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?