Hunter v. Blackburn
Plaintiff: Michael Howard Hunter
Defendant: Ray Blackburn and thief
Case Number: 4:2018cv04158
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER dated January 21, 2019 Received from Michael Hunter to Court RE: Possible Evasion of Service but Served Hunter v. Blackburn. (KLE)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION and Application for Issuance of Writ of Subpeona Ad Testificandum, for Arrest and Production, and for an Immediate Hearing, and to Add as Party Social Security Administration [Striking the United States Attorney as a Named Party] by Michael Howard Hunter. (KLE)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ray Blackburn. 1 original summons, 1 USM 285, 1 A085s, and Case Documents #1 , #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , and #9 delivered to USMS via electronic delivery. (SLT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Service LETTER with enclosed Doc 8, Sample Summons and USM285, Blank Summons, Blank USM285, AO85 and Memo sent by Clerk's Office to Michael Howard Hunter. Delivered via hand delivery at the counter in Sioux Falls. (JLS)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER that plaintiff shall complete and send to the Clerk of Court a separate summons and USM-285 form for each defendant. Upon receipt of the completed summons and USM-285 forms, the Clerk of Court will issue the summonses. If the completed summons and USM-285 forms are not submitted as directed, the complaint may be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve the completed summonses, together with a copies of all documents filed as of 01/02/2019 upon the defendants. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/02/2019. (MWT) Mailed to Michael Hunter via U.S. Postal Service on 1/2/2019 (SST).
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Writ of Mandatory Injunction by Michael Howard Hunter. (KLE)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT and SUIT IN EQUITY by Plaintiff Michael Howard Hunter re #1 Complaint. (KLE)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/28/2018. (KLE) Mailed to Michael Howard Hunter via USPS.
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Michael Howard Hunter. (KLE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Howard Hunter. (KLE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Plaintiff Michael Howard Hunter re #1 Complaint (KLE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Howard Hunter. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Howard Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?