DeCory v. Young et al

Petitioner: William Martin Ardene DeCory
Respondent: Darin Young and Attorney General for the State of South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2019cv04005
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner William Martin Ardene DeCory re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). (DJP)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER Received from Petitioner to Judge Piersol dated 2/5/2019. (DJP)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for courts to pay debts/fines imposed by William Martin Ardene DeCory. (DJP)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet and 2254 packet sent by Clerk's Office to Petitioner. (DJP)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (DJP)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by William Martin Ardene DeCory. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeCory v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Martin Ardene DeCory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?