Persaud et al v. Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: D.O. Michael V. Persaud and Shannon Persaud
Defendant: Poppema-Sikma Construction, Inc., Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C. and Chamberlain Tile Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04010
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Certified copy of Order mailed to State Court Clerk. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/1/19. (SLW)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael V. Persaud, Shannon Persaud. (Reinschmidt, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C. of Withdrawal of Notice and Petition for Removal of Action. (Joyce, Meghann)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant CMBA's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Chamberlain Tile Company, Inc., Poppema-Sikma Construction, Inc. by Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C.. (Joyce, Meghann)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C.. Certificate of Service (Joyce, Meghann)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony L. Osborn on behalf of Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C.. (Osborn, Anthony)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW)
January 18, 2019 Filing Fee Received from Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C.. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2966788. (SLW)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C. from First Judicial Circuit, Union County, case number 63CIV18-000267. Filed in shell case on 1/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- CMBA Admission of Service)(SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Persaud et al v. Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poppema-Sikma Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannon, Moss, Brygger & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Meghann M. Joyce
Represented By: Anthony L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamberlain Tile Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.O. Michael V. Persaud
Represented By: David L. Reinschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Persaud
Represented By: David L. Reinschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?