Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc. v. Golden Rule Home Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc.
Defendant: Golden Rule Home Services, LLC and Alan Gentry
Case Number: 4:2019cv04014
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/20/19. (CLR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Arndt, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Arndt on behalf of All Defendants. (Arndt, Mark)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Golden Rule Home Services, LLC on 02/27/2019, filed by Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc.. (Engel, Joel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Alan Gentry on 02/27/2019, filed by Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc.. (Engel, Joel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alan Gentry, Golden Rule Home Services, LLC. 2 original summons delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Second Summons)(SST)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc.. (Engel, Joel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/REPORT on Determination of Action Regarding Patent or Trademark emailed US Patent & Trademark Office. (JLS)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-2967309) filed by Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc. in shell case on 1/21/19. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc. v. Golden Rule Home Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Rule Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Sander J. Morehead
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Represented By: Troy Nicholas Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Home Services, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Gentry
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?