Johnson v. Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Johnson
Defendant: Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04017
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Discovery Report re #7 Order for Discovery Report Joint by Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.. Related document: #7 Order for Discovery Report.(Hertz, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/8/19. (SST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2019: #1 Letter to Counsel) (SST).
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wellmark, Inc. for Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Hertz on behalf of Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Johnson. Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Bishop, Jami)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.. 1 original summons, 2 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (SST)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX400049132) filed by James Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/21/17 letter from Dr. Krabbenhoft, #2 Exhibit B - EOB, #3 Exhibit C - Appeal Letter, #4 Exhibit D - 4/13/18 Denial, #5 Exhibit E - 8/28/18 Denial) (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Jami J. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?