Thompson et al v. Harrie et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Thompson, Melissa Prochnow and Jamie Helgeson
Defendant: The Nilles Law Firm, Nodak Insurance Company, Willism Harrie, N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Mutual Group, Inc., Nilles and William Harrie
Estate Plaintiff: Winfeld Thompson and Nicholas Helgeson
Case Number: 4:2019cv04023
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Turbak Berry, Nancy)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, Nodak Mutual Group, Inc.. (Brandt, Angela)
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Crossclaim, by N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, Nodak Mutual Group, Inc.. (Brandt, Angela)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/12/2019. (SLT)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Lawyer Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, Nodak Mutual Group, Inc. by William Harrie, The Nilles Law Firm. (Sutton, Jason)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick H. O'Neill, Jr. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 2/8/2019. (SLT)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Extend re #7 MOTION re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Motion for Judicial Notice by Jamie Helgeson, Nicholas Helgeson, Melissa Prochnow, Teresa Ann Thompson, Winfeld Thompson. (Zephier, Robin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by William Harrie, The Nilles Law Firm to Cross-Claim. (Sutton, Jason)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Patrick H. O'Neill, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2997941) by N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, Nodak Mutual Group, Inc.. (Brandt, Angela)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, Nodak Mutual Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent N.I. Holdings, Inc. for Nodak Insurance Company; Other Affiliate Nodak Mutual Group, Inc. for N.I. Holdings, Inc.. (Brandt, Angela)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against William Harrie, The Nilles Law Firm by Nodak Mutual Group, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, N.I. Holdings, Inc.. (Brandt, Angela)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Motion for Judicial Notice, #5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by William Harrie, The Nilles Law Firm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Assignment) (Sutton, Jason)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Motion for Judicial Notice by William Harrie, The Nilles Law Firm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Motions to Dismiss) (Sutton, Jason)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by William Harrie, The Nilles Law Firm. (Sutton, Jason)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by William Harrie, The Nilles Law Firm. (Sutton, Jason)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Beranek Brandt on behalf of N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, Nodak Mutual Group, Inc.. (Brandt, Angela)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 JOINDER by Defendants N.I. Holdings, Inc., Nodak Insurance Company, Nodak Mutual Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Brandt, Angela)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 73 MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 AO85)(SLT)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court - Third Judicial Circuit - County of Brooksings, case number 05CIV19-000006. ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400049193) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Case Documents)(SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Harrie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nilles Law Firm
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas J. Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nodak Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas J. Welk
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Represented By: Patrick H. O'Neill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willism Harrie
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas J. Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.I. Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas J. Welk
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Represented By: Patrick H. O'Neill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nodak Mutual Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas J. Welk
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Represented By: Patrick H. O'Neill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilles
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas J. Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Harrie
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas J. Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Thompson
Represented By: Seamus Culhane
Represented By: Robin L. Zephier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Prochnow
Represented By: Seamus Culhane
Represented By: Robin L. Zephier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Helgeson
Represented By: Seamus Culhane
Represented By: Robin L. Zephier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Winfeld Thompson
Represented By: Seamus Culhane
Represented By: Robin L. Zephier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Nicholas Helgeson
Represented By: Seamus Culhane
Represented By: Robin L. Zephier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?