Albrecht et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Alex Albrecht and Elizabeth Albrecht
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04032
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek A. Nelsen on behalf of Alex Albrecht, Elizabeth Albrecht. (Nelsen, Derek)
April 8, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Certificate of Clerk was filed in error and should be disregarded. (SLW)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 Filed in error: CERTIFICATE of Clerk (SLW) Modified on 4/8/2019 (SLW).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 04/05/2019. (SAC)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiffs Property Disclosure, #3 Exhibit 3 Water Repair Estimate, #4 Exhibit 4 Plaintiffs Answer to Attorney Kings Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants December 7, 2017 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants August 25, 2016 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 Stephen Landons Letter of July 28, 2016, #8 Exhibit 8 Plaintiffs December 9, 2016 Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 Defendants December 14, 2016 Letter, #10 Exhibit 10 Plaintiffs December 15, 2016 Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 Defendants December 16, 2016 Letter) (Sherrill, Tracye) Modified exhibit description on 4/8/2019 (SRA).
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery D. Collins on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Collins, Jeffery)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Second. (Sherrill, Tracye)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Unopposed. (Sherrill, Tracye)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracye L. Sherrill on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sherrill, Tracye)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Alex Albrecht, Elizabeth Albrecht. (Preheim, Eric)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Electronic Summons, AO85 form and and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-2991238) filed by Elizabeth Albrecht, Alex Albrecht in shell case on 2/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albrecht et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Albrecht
Represented By: Molly K. Beck
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Albrecht
Represented By: Molly K. Beck
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracye L. Sherrill
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?