Appleton et al v. Big City Motors
Plaintiff: Chelsie Jo Johnson and Natasha Appleton
Defendant: Big City Motors
Case Number: 4:2019cv04037
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 Mail sent to Natasha Appleton & Chelsie Jo Johnson was returned as undeliverable. #5 Letter Sent was returned. (CLR) Modified on 4/4/2019 spoke with Chelsie Jo Johnson, obtained updated mailing address and sent letter and docket sheet to same via USPS. Unable to contact Natasha Appleton via telephone(CLR).
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 Mail sent to Chelsie Jo Johnson was returned as undeliverable. #6 Order Reassigning Case, was returned. (SST) Modified on 4/4/2019 Spoke with Chelsie Jo Johnson and obtained updated mailing Address. Order Reassigning Case sent to her via USPS(CLR).
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 Mail sent to Natasha Appleton was returned as undeliverable. #6 Order Reassigning Case, was returned. (SST)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol no longer assigned to case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 2/28/19. (SST) Mailed to Natasha Appleton and Chelsea Jo Johnson on 2/28/2019 (SST).
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Natasha Appleton and Chelsie Jo Johnson. (SST)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiffs Natasha Appleton, Chelsie Jo Johnson signed by Charles Ray Johnson who is not a party to this case. (SST) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (SST).
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION: MOTION to Electronically File Documents signed by Charles Ray Johnson who is not a party to this case. (SST)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Natasha Appleton, Chelsie Jo Johnson. (SST)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Natasha Appleton, Chelsie Jo Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Appleton et al v. Big City Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsie Jo Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big City Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?