Johnson v. North Western Energy et al
Plaintiff: Charles Ray Johnson
Defendant: North Western Energy and Jeff Decker
Case Number: 4:2019cv04038
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT of DISMISSAL; Ordered the Joint Motion for Dismissal #7 is granted and Motions #2 and #3 are denied as moot. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 02/25/2019. (KLE)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to DISMISS by Jeff Decker, North Western Energy. (Haigh, Mark)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange for all further proceedings. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/21/2019. (KLE)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 New Case LETTER sent by Clerk's Office to Charles Ray Johnson. (KLE)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of the Service of Summons by Charles Ray Johnson. (KLE)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Charles Ray Johnson will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. by Charles Ray Johnson. (KLE)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Ray Johnson. (KLE)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Charles Ray Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. North Western Energy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ray Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Western Energy
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Decker
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?