Hallan v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julie Hallan
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04054
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2019 Motions due by 1/10/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/03/2019. (MWT)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 Discovery Report re #8 Order for Discovery Report by Julie Hallan. Related document: #8 Order for Discovery Report.(Marlow, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Permitting Inspection and Granting Motion to Preserve Evidence re #18 Proposed Order filed by Julie Hallan. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/2/19. (SRA)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER by Julie Hallan re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE (Marlow, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2019 re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE filed by Julie Hallan before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier.. (Court Reporter: FTR) (SLW)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC hearing on Motion to Preserve. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 2* before U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/25/19. (JLS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE filed by Julie Hallan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resume) (Marlow, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Motion Response re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE filed by Julie Hallan. (Marlow, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE Supplemental Affidavit of Elizabeth Hertz filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DVD to be delivered to Clerk's Office) (Hertz, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2019 RECEIVED DVD marked as Exhibit 1 to #13 Affidavit in Opposition re #3 Motion to Preserve Evidence. Placed in Vault in Sioux Falls Clerk's Office. (JLS)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE of Elizabeth S. Hertz filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from EMC to Hallan, #2 Exhibit Letter from Thomas Frankman to Mike Marlow, #3 Exhibit Brief, #4 Exhibit Kozak Affidavit) (Hertz, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE of Max Winstead filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Hertz on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/2/19. (DJP)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Frankman, Thomas)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Frankman, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE filed by Julie Hallan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Angela Hinz, #2 Exhibit Letter from Thomas Frankman, #3 Exhibit Letter to David Estaver, #4 Exhibit Letter from David Estaver, #5 Exhibit Order, #6 Exhibit Email from Thomas Frankman) (Marlow, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE filed by Julie Hallan. (Marlow, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE by Julie Hallan. (Marlow, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hy-Vee, Inc.. 1 original summons, A085 form and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Hy-Vee, Inc., #2 AO85 Form)(JLS)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX400049431) filed by Julie Hallan. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallan v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Frankman
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Hallan
Represented By: Beau C. Barrett
Represented By: Michael F. Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?