Olsen et al v. Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska

Plaintiff: Annette Olsen and David Olsen
Defendant: Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2019cv04090
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/9/19. (JLS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Travis on behalf of Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. (Travis, Richard)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Mark Gokie on 5-23-2019, filed by Annette Olsen. (Trzynka, Robert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Annette Olsen. (Trzynka, Robert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3064329) filed by David Olsen, Annette Olsen in shell case on 5/20/2019. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsen et al v. Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Olsen
Represented By: Daniel K. Brendtro
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Olsen
Represented By: Daniel K. Brendtro
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Mutual Insurance Company of Nebraska
Represented By: Richard L. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?