Gutierrez et al v. Wolpert et al
Plaintiff: Juana Gutierrez and Andres Aldape, Jr.
Defendant: Dr. Michael Wolpert, Midlands Clinic, P.C., Siouxland Surgery Center, L.L.P. and Michael Wolpert
Case Number: 4:2019cv04091
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Issued Midlands Clinic, P.C. Acknowledgement filed by Andres Aldape, Jr, Juana Gutierrez. (Johnson, Brendan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Issued Michael Wolpert, M.D. Acknowledgement filed by Andres Aldape, Jr, Juana Gutierrez. (Johnson, Brendan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/25/19. (SLW)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Midlands Clinic, P.C., Michael Wolpert. (Wright, Jeff)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian N. Aleinikoff for Andres Aldape, Jr, and Juana Gutierrez. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/7/19. (SRA)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bruce L. Braley for Andres Aldape, Jr, and Juana Gutierrez. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/7/19. (SRA)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tim J. Luetkemeyer for Andres Aldape, and Juana Gutierrez. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/7/19. (SRA)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney TIM J. LUETKEMEYER to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3078406) by Andres Aldape, Jr, Juana Gutierrez. (Ramsey, Erica)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney BRUCE L. BRALEY to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3078378) by Andres Aldape, Jr, Juana Gutierrez. (Ramsey, Erica)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney BRIAN N. ALEINIKOFF to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3078348) by Andres Aldape, Jr, Juana Gutierrez. (Ramsey, Erica)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Juana Gutierrez, Andres Aldape, Jr. (Johnson, Brendan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (DLC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Andres Aldape, Jr, Juana Gutierrez. (Johnson, Brendan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3064561) filed by Juana Gutierrez, Andres Aldape, Jr in shell case on 5/20/19. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez et al v. Wolpert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midlands Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Jeff W. Wright
Represented By: John C. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siouxland Surgery Center, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wolpert
Represented By: Jeff W. Wright
Represented By: John C. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Gutierrez
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Erica A. Ramsey
Represented By: Tim J. Luetkemeyer
Represented By: Brian N. Aleinikoff
Represented By: Bruce L. Braley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Aldape, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Erica A. Ramsey
Represented By: Tim J. Luetkemeyer
Represented By: Brian N. Aleinikoff
Represented By: Bruce L. Braley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?