Horsley v. Heart Hospital of South Dakota, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronda Horsley
Defendant: Paul E. Meyer and Heart Hospital of South Dakota, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04092
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 6/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter to Counsel)(SRA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Heart Hospital of South Dakota, LLC. (Sudbeck, Roger)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Ronda Horsley. (Trzynka, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Ronda Horsley. (Trzynka, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand of Paul E. Meyer, M.D. by Paul E. Meyer. (Haigh, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dan Rasmus for Ronda Horsley. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 05/28/2019. (SAC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Heart Hospital of South Dakota, LLC, Paul E. Meyer. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Meyer)(SLW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney DAN RASMUS to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3066918) by Ronda Horsley. (Trzynka, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Ronda Horsley. (Trzynka, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE re: Rule 73 Memo. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(SKK)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3066511) filed by Ronda Horsley in shell case on 5/22/19. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horsley v. Heart Hospital of South Dakota, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Meyer
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart Hospital of South Dakota, LLC
Represented By: Roger A. Sudbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Horsley
Represented By: Daniel K. Brendtro
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Represented By: Dan Rasmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?