William v. Tenhaken et al

Plaintiff: Christopher William and Christopher Bruce
Defendant: Sean Coistra and Paul Tenhaken
Case Number: 4:2019cv04096
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Christopher William re #1 Complaint. (SKK)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE WRIT OF MANDAMUS CONCERNING A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Christopher William. (SKK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address and MOTION to Serve Summons at US Court expense by Christopher William. (SAC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Christopher William re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (SAC) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/17/2019) (SAC).
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT (Writ of Habeas Corpus and Counter-Claim) by Plaintiff Christopher William re #1 Complaint. (SKK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT - Amended Claim by Plaintiff Christopher William re #1 Complaint. (SKK)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Christopher William. (Attachments: #1 docket sheet) (SKK)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Christopher William will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (SKK)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher William. (SKK)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Christopher William. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William v. Tenhaken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Coistra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Tenhaken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?