Tripp v. Cook et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Defendant: Larry Anderson, Kyle Bender, Tyler Cook, Eric Zimmerman and Jessica Cook
Case Number: 4:2019cv04100
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 New Case LETTER with enclosed Docket Sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Kevin Tripp. (SRA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00347. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Clerk of the Court shall transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the South Dakota District Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/29/2019. (cmn) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/12/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp.(kdr) (Docket text modified on 5/15/2019 to correct Plaintiff's name.) (thd). [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/12/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 5/15/2019 to correct Plaintiff's name.) (thd). [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripp v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?