Ghanem v. Carrington Apartments, LLC
Plaintiff: Aladdin A. Ghanem
Defendant: Carrington Apartments, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04116
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Aladdin A. Ghanem.(Olivier, Kasey)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel re Rule 26(f))(JLS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by Carrington Apartments, LLC. (Jelen, Melissa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Notice of Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Carrington Apartments, LLC. (Jelen, Melissa) Modified to change event per LR 12.1 on 8/1/2019 (SLW).
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa R. Jelen on behalf of Carrington Apartments, LLC. (Jelen, Melissa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carrington Apartments, LLC. One Summmons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP) (Attachment 2 replaced and regenerated on 7/10/2019) (DJP).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Ghanem vs. Carrington Apartments, LLC). (Olivier, Kasey) Modified on 7/10/2019 (DJP).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050325) filed by Aladdin A. Ghanem. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghanem v. Carrington Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Melissa R. Jelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aladdin A. Ghanem
Represented By: Kasey L. Olivier
Represented By: Ashley M. Miles-Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?