O'Meara Hernes v. Intex Recreation Corp.
Plaintiff: Susan J. O'Meara Hernes
Defendant: Intex Recreation Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04122
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2020, Motions due by 5/1/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on August 15, 2019. (DLC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Discovery Report (Form 52 Report) of Parties Planning Meeting by Susan J. O'Meara Hernes.(Hinrichs, John) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (JLS).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/17/19. (SRA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Intex Recreation Corp.. (Jones, Bruce)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Intex Recreation Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Intex Corp. for Intex Recreation Corp.. (Jones, Bruce)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce G. Jones on behalf of Intex Recreation Corp.. (Jones, Bruce)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Intex Recreation Corp. from the Second Judicial District, State of South Dakota, County of Lincoln, case number 41CIV19-318. ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3105292) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- California Secretary of State Entity Detail, #3 Exhibit C- Plaintiff's demand letter, #4 Exhibit D- Notice)(SRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Meara Hernes v. Intex Recreation Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan J. O'Meara Hernes
Represented By: John R. Hinrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intex Recreation Corp.
Represented By: Bruce G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?