Huntimer v. Young et al
Petitioner: Timothy J. Huntimer
Respondent: Darin Young and The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2019cv04125
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 MOTION to DISMISS PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Objections to R&R due by 9/10/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/27/2019. (CG)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee by October 15, 2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/26/2019. (CG)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLT)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy J. Huntimer. (SLT)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 Order filed by Timothy J. Huntimer. (SLT)
August 15, 2019 RECEIVED South Dakota State Supreme Court record case number 28661. The record is located on Clerk of Court N Drive. (MWT)
August 15, 2019 RECEIVED State court records from Minnehaha County Clerk of Courts: Criminal cases 14-3820, 14-1631, and 14-2714. The records are located on Clerk of Court N Drive. (JLS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Darin Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment a - Sentencing Hearing, #2 Attachment B - Order Granting Motion to Correct Illegal Sentence in Part, #3 Attachment C - Order Dismissing Appeal) (Wald, Sherri)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Darin Young. (Wald, Sherri)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing service upon respondents and requiring the parties to file briefs regarding timeliness of petition by August 23, 2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/22/2019. (CG)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.).Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SLT)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Timothy J. Huntimer. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntimer v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy J. Huntimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?