French v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lori Jean French
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv04127
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Roche on behalf of Andrew M. Saul. (Roche, Meghan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Admission of Service Acknowledgement filed by Lori Jean French. (Weidenaar, Bram)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Lori Jean French. (Weidenaar, Bram)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3112632) filed by Lori Jean French in shell case on 7/22/2019. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Jean French
Represented By: Bram Weidenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?