Wheeler v. V-Belt Global Supply, LLC
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wheeler
Defendant: V-Belt Global Supply, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04148
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/17/2019. (CLR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by V-Belt Global Supply, LLC. (Raymond, Cheri)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheri S. Raymond on behalf of V-Belt Global Supply, LLC. (Raymond, Cheri)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint MOTION to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/17/2019. (CLR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer by V-Belt Global Supply, LLC. (Raymond, Cheri)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Shelly Hart, V-Belt Global Supply in SFSD on 8-28-19, filed by Cheryl Wheeler. (Landon, Stephen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Danielle Naki of V-Belt Global Supply on 8-28-19, filed by Cheryl Wheeler. (Landon, Stephen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to V-Belt Global Supply, LLC. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons - V-Belt Global Carson City, #2 Summons - V-Belt Global Sioux Falls, #3 AO85)(CLR)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3141406) filed by Cheryl Wheeler in shell case on 8/27/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. V-Belt Global Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V-Belt Global Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wheeler
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?