Bixler v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Renae Bixler
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Wellmark of South Dakota Inc. and Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv04154
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Martin J. Bishop for Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/31/2019. (CLR)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Meredith Shippee for Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/31/2019. (CLR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Martin Bishop to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3184857) by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Sanford, Steven)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Meredith Shippee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3184844) by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Sanford, Steven)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/21/2019. (CLR)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ahsaki E. Baptist for Federal Express Corporation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/21/2019. (CLR)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent WellPoint California Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Anthem, Inc., Other Affiliate Anthem Holding Corp. for Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Sanford, Steven)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Sanford, Steven)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Sanford on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Sanford, Steven)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Express Corporation. (Lovrien, Brett)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation. (Lovrien, Brett)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Ahsaki E. Baptist to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3175984) by Federal Express Corporation. (Lovrien, Brett)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wellmark of South Dakota Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wellmark, Inc. for Wellmark of South Dakota Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wellmark of South Dakota Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Lovrien on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Federal Express Corporation. (Lovrien, Brett)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Federal Express Corporation . (Lovrien, Brett)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Federal Express Corporation on Registered Agent-CT Corporation System (Johnson, Steven)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Answer by Wellmark of South Dakota Inc.. (Eden, Shane) Modified to change event from motion to notice on 9/24/2019 (DJP).
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint & Civil Cover Sheet served on CT Corporation System on 09/16/19, filed by Renae Bixler. (Johnson, Steven)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Renae Bixler. (Johnson, Steven)
September 5, 2019 Filing Fee Received from Renae Bixler. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400050728. (MPP)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Federal Express Corporation, Wellmark of South Dakota Inc.. 3 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX4000050728) filed by Renae Bixler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Attempted Preauthorization for Surgery, #2 Exhibit B: Explanation of Benefits, #3 Exhibit C: Sioux Falls Specialty Hospital submitted Appeal, flash drive in SF Clerk's Vault #4 Exhibit D; Summary Plan Description) (KLE) Modified on 9/6/2019 to add descriptions (KLE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bixler v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark of South Dakota Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renae Bixler
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?