Zaiko v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Zaiko
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company and Meridian Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04161
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/29/2019. (SAC)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Meridian Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company for Meridian Security Insurance Company. (Frankenstein, Sara)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 First Amended Complaint by Meridian Security Insurance Company. (Frankenstein, Sara)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by John Zaiko. (McCahren, Lee)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #9 Amended Complaint was filed in error and should be disregarded. (McCahren, Lee)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) First AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by John Zaiko. (McCahren, Lee) Modified on 10/17/2019 (CLR).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/17/2019. (SAC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by John Zaiko. (McCahren, Lee)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company answer due 10/29/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/15/2019. (SAC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Garry on behalf of State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Garry, William)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Frankenstein, Sara)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 9-23-19 Acknowledgement filed by John Zaiko. (McCahren, Lee)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. 1 Summmons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3156816) filed by John Zaiko in shell case on 9/19/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaiko v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zaiko
Represented By: Lee C. (Kit) McCahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: William C. Garry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?