Clarambeau v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kori Sue Clarambeau
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv04170
Filed: September 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Ramsdell, Alison)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons, AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certificate of Service A085)(DJP)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/02/2019. (LH)
September 29, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Kori Sue Clarambeau. (SKK)
September 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Kori Sue Clarambeau in shell case on 9/29/19. (SKK) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/30/2019) (SKK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarambeau v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kori Sue Clarambeau
Represented By: Steven R. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?