Hemsher v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ryan Hemsher
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv04172
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Justin L. Bell . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bengford, Stephanie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #14 Affidavit of Richard E. Engels filed by Nicholas Ryan Hemsher. (DLC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Bengford, Stephanie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE WAIVER by Nicholas Ryan Hemsher. (DLC)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Richard A. Engels . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bengford, Stephanie)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Affidavit from Petitioner's former appellate counsel and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 waiver form) (CG) Modified: Mailed to Nicholas Hemsher on 10/31/2019 (JLS).
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Appellate Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Appellate Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Bengford, Stephanie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE WAIVER by Nicholas Ryan Hemsher. (DLC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The clerk of court shall provide to Mr. Hemsher copies of the sentencing transcript in his underlying criminal case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/17/2019. (CG) Modified: Mailed order to Mr. Hemsher and Mailed Sentencing Transcript to the warden at FCI Oxford via US Postal Service on 10/17/2019 (JLS).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 waiver form) (CG) Mailed to Hemsher on 10/8/2019 (SLW).
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/1/2019. (CG) Modified: Mailed to Nicholas Ryan Hemsher on 10/3/2019 (JLS).
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (DLC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 4:16-cr-40070-02 filed by Nicholas Ryan Hemsher. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemsher v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ryan Hemsher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Koliner
Represented By: Stephanie C. Bengford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?