Duffy et al v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marlene Duffy and Bernard Duffy
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04179
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Discovery Report - Joint Report by Hy-Vee, Inc..(Frankman, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/06/2019. (LH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Plaintiffs Bernard Duffy, Marlene Duffy on CT Corporation System, as Registered Agent for Hy-Vee, Inc. (Nelsen, Derek)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Hertz on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Frankman, Thomas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Frankman, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hy-Vee, Inc. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3182574) filed by Marlene Duffy, Bernard Duffy in shell case on 10/28/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy et al v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Duffy
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Duffy
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Frankman
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?