Boerigter v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Boerigter
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04184
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/30/2019. (KLE)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company Unopposed. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz on behalf of Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by John Boerigter. (Nelsen, Derek)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. 1 Summmons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3191775) filed by John Boerigter in shell case on 11/12/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boerigter v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boerigter
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?