Church v. Nelson
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Church
Defendant: Stace Nelson
Case Number: 4:2019cv04193
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/22/20. (SLW)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Jeffrey Church. (Hagen, Alex)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication by Jeffrey Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hanson County Sheriff Wingert Affidavit) (Hagen, Alex)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Claire E. Wilka re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Declaratory Relief . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screenshot of Senator's Nelson's public Facebook page, #2 Exhibit B - Screenshot of Convention Pool posted on 9/7/19 with comments by other Facebook users, #3 Exhibit C - Screenshot of expanded view of comment section on Convention Poll) (Hagen, Alex)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Church re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Declaratory Relief . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screen capture from Stace Nelson Facebook page, #2 Exhibit B - Screen capture from Stace Nelson Facebook page, #3 Exhibit C - Screen capture from Stace Nelson Facebook page, #4 Exhibit D - Screen capture from Stace Nelson Facebook page, #5 Exhibit E - Screen capture from Stace Nelson Facebook page, #6 Exhibit F - Screen capture from Stace Nelson Facebook page, #7 Exhibit G - Screen capture from Stace Nelson Facebook page, #8 Exhibit H - Screen capture from third party that showed additional comments that were made on the page after Church was blocked) (Hagen, Alex)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Declaratory Relief filed by Jeffrey Church. (Hagen, Alex)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief and Declaratory Relief by Jeffrey Church. (Hagen, Alex)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stace Nelson. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued - Nelson - Individually, #2 Summons issued - Nelson - Official, #3 AO85)(MSB)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400051313) filed by Jeffrey Church. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Church
Represented By: Alex M. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stace Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?