FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC v. CITIBANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Defendant: Citibank N.A., CITIMORTGAGE and CITIFINANCIAL
Case Number: 4:2019cv04195
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/30/2020. (SLT)
January 29, 2020 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Faloni, Jr. for FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/22/2020. (CLR)
January 22, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney David A. Faloni, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3241359) by FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard)
January 22, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Williams on behalf of FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard)
January 21, 2020 Filing 57 DECLARATION in Support re #55 MOTION to DISMISS of Christopher Comstock filed by Citibank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2013 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Consent Judgment - Citibank, #3 Exhibit Consent Order - Citibank NA, #4 Exhibit Consent Order - Faloni and Assoc, #5 Exhibit Stipulation and Consent, #6 Exhibit March 18, 2014 final report) (Brost, Ashley) Modified Docket Text on 1/22/2020 (DLC).
January 21, 2020 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re #55 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
January 21, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to DISMISS by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines Set a Date for Defendant Citibank, N.A. to File Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/30/2019. (CLR)
December 23, 2019 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines Set a Date for Defendant Citibank, N.A. to File Motion to Dismiss by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Panoff. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/19/2019. (SLT)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan Rice. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/19/2019. (SLT)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Comstock. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/19/2019. (SLT)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lucia Nale. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/19/2019. (SLT)
December 19, 2019 Filing 48 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Citibank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citicorp LLC, Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc. for Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Attorney Thomas V. Panoff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney Nathan A. Rice to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3219978) by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney Christopher S. Comstock to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3219976) by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 19, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Attorney Lucia Nale to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3219973) by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Roche on behalf of Citibank N.A.. (Roche, Vincent)
December 18, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley R. Brost on behalf of Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley)
December 5, 2019 Filing 41 PHV LETTER sent by Clerk's Office to Michael Shortt via email and David A. Faloni via USPS. (SLT)
December 5, 2019 Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. (SLT)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/5/19. (SB)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/5/2019. (SLT)
December 4, 2019 Filing 38 PHV LETTER emailed by Clerk's Office to David Faloni, Marc Singer, Lucia Nale, Thomas Panoff, and Christopher Comstock. (SLT)
December 4, 2019 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:19-cv-09494. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 4, 2019 Filing 36 Letter from David A. Faloni Esq.. (FALONI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from David A. Faloni, Esq.. (FALONI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #34 Order. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of South Dakota. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/16/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 33 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/16/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRISTOPHER S. COMSTOCK, THOMAS V. PANOFF and LUCIA NALE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lucia Nale to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10038061.) (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Panoff to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10038049.) (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher S. Comstock to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10038008.) (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to LUCIA NALE, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW040730 (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to CHRISTOPHER COMSTOCK, ESQ. and THOMAS PANOFF, ESQ.: $ 300, receipt number NEW040729 (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/9/2019. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Defendant's Application/Letter for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of LUCIA NALE, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/9/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 28 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael J. Shortt - Pro Hac Vice Admission - Lucia Nale, #2 Declaration of Lucia Nale - Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lucia Nale)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 Joint Discovery Plan by CITIBANK, N.A..(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Defendant's Application/Letter for the Pro Hac Vice admission of CHRISTOPHER S. COMSTOCK, ESQ. and THOMAS V. PANOFF, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/7/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from Michael J. Shortt - Admission for Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael J. Shortt - Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Declaration of Thomas V. Panoff - Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Declaration of Christopher S. Comstock - Admission for Pro Hac Vice)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: The parties' request to adjourn the Rule 16 conference is denied, as the Court would like to discuss with the parties the pending motion to transfer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/7/2019. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #23 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Discovery Plan and to Appear for a Scheduling Conference by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from David A. Faloni, Jr., Esq.. (FALONI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel must become a registered e-filer by 10/9/2019. For CM/ECF information, please visit the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/20/2019. (jqb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 10/7/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/20/2019. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CITIBANK, N.A. re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of South Dakota (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of South Dakota (FALONI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER administratively terminating as withdrawn #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant may refile its motion to dismiss or otherwiserespond to Plaintiffs complaint until 30 days after this Court issues a decision on Defendants motion to transfer. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/3/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #16 Defendant's MOTION to Transfer Case to District of South Dakota. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of South Dakota by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Citibank, NA Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER extending time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 30 days after the Court issues a final decision on Citibank's motion to transfer. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/24/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Letter with Text of Proposed Order requesting leave to file a motion to transfer. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/19/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Citibank, N.A. requesting permission to file motion to transfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. FALONI, JR on behalf of FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC (FALONI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re #6 Defendant's Letter with Text of Proposed Order. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 6/17/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/7/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Marc C. Singer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES SHORTT on behalf of CITIBANK, N.A. (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Letter with Proposed Order. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and the same is hereby extended until and including 5/16/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/11/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Marc C. Signer. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIBANK, N.A. identifying Citigroup, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITIBANK, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-1802-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9571346), filed by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Notice of Removal to All Adverse Parties)(SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC v. CITIBANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Represented By: Vincent M. Roche
Represented By: Thomas V. Panoff
Represented By: Christopher S. Comstock
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Ashley R. Brost
Represented By: Nathan A. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIMORTGAGE
Represented By: Vincent M. Roche
Represented By: Thomas V. Panoff
Represented By: Christopher S. Comstock
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Ashley R. Brost
Represented By: Nathan A. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIFINANCIAL
Represented By: Vincent M. Roche
Represented By: Thomas V. Panoff
Represented By: Christopher S. Comstock
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Ashley R. Brost
Represented By: Nathan A. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: David A. Faloni, Jr.
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?