Ekeren v. Brennan et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia K. Ekeren
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 4:2020cv04005
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued as to USA US SD District Attorney Acknowledgement filed by Cynthia K. Ekeren. (Pochop, Stephanie)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of Megan J. Brennan. (Druley (USA), Delia)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(DLC)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Cynthia K. Ekeren. (Pochop, Stephanie)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 73 MEMO. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(SLT)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Cynthia K. Ekeren. (Pochop, Stephanie)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3232193) filed by Cynthia K. Ekeren in shell case on 1/8/2020. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekeren v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia K. Ekeren
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?