Assist Financial Services, Inc. v. Freight One Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Assist Financial Services, Inc.
Defendant: Freight One Transportation, Inc. and David Palacios
Case Number: 4:2020cv04015
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Freight One Transportation, Inc., David Palacios. (Mailed to 16843 Hidden Creek Drive, Victorville, CA 92395) (MWT)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Assist Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Information) (Joyce, Meghann)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Assist Financial Services, Inc.. (Joyce, Meghann)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Assist Financial Services, Inc.. (Joyce, Meghann)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE as to David Palacios served on February 4, 2020. (Joyce, Meghann)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Freight One Transportation, Inc. served on February 4, 2020. (Joyce, Meghann)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Freight One Transportation, Inc., David Palacios. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3247178) filed by Assist Financial Services, Inc. in shell case on 01/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Contract, #2 Exhibit B: UCC Financing Statement, #3 Exhibit C: Continuing Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D: Notice of Assignment) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assist Financial Services, Inc. v. Freight One Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freight One Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assist Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Meghann M. Joyce
Represented By: Christopher D. Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?