Sissoko v. Billion Chevrolet, Sioux Falls, South Dakota; et al
Plaintiff: Karim Sissoko
Defendant: Billion Chevrolet, Sioux Falls, South Dakota; et al, Dave R Billion, The Registered Agent, Chief/Assistant Police Chief, Davison County Treasurer/Administrator and Ricardo David Altamirano Cruz
Case Number: 4:2020cv04048
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis A. Warner on behalf of Chief/Assistant Police Chief, Davison County Treasurer/Administrator. (Warner, Alexis)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chief/Assistant Police Chief, Davison County Treasurer/Administrator. (Thimsen, Gary)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary P. Thimsen on behalf of Chief/Assistant Police Chief, Davison County Treasurer/Administrator. (Thimsen, Gary)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dave R Billion, Billion Chevrolet, Sioux Falls, South Dakota; et al, The Registered Agent. (Prostrollo, Lisa)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Dave R Billion, Billion Chevrolet, Sioux Falls, South Dakota; et al, The Registered Agent. (Prostrollo, Lisa)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karim Sissoko. Dave R Billion served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020; The Registered Agent served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (MSB)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karim Sissoko. Chief/Assistant Police Chief served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; Davison County Treasurer/Administrator served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (MSB)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and completed summons(es). A new case has been opened. Your summmons(es) will be issued. You are responsible for arranging service of the summons(es) and complaint on the defendant(s). Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. CM/ECF Pro Se Litigant Application Form also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Billion Chevrolet, Sioux Falls, South Dakota; et al. Five Summons(es), Rule 73 Memos, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to plaintiff. (MSB)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400051990) filed by Karim Sissoko. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sissoko v. Billion Chevrolet, Sioux Falls, South Dakota; et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karim Sissoko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billion Chevrolet, Sioux Falls, South Dakota; et al
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave R Billion
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Registered Agent
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief/Assistant Police Chief
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Represented By: Alexis A. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davison County Treasurer/Administrator
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Represented By: Alexis A. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo David Altamirano Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?