Smith v. Barnett et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Edgar Smith
Defendant: Jess Boysen, Heather Bowers, John Shyne, Tammy Sunde, William Golden, David Stephan, Darin Young, Frank Geaghan, Paige Bock, Keith Ditmanson, David Lentsch, Douglas P. Barnett, Kurtis Brown, Eugene Regier and Justin Kuku
Case Number: 4:2020cv04066
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand Back to State Court by Defendants Douglas P. Barnett, Paige Bock, Heather Bowers, Jess Boysen, Kurtis Brown, Keith Ditmanson, Frank Geaghan, William Golden, Justin Kuku, David Lentsch, Eugene Regier, John Shyne, David Stephan, Tammy Sunde, Darin Young (Engel, Joel) Modified on 5/26/2020 (SLT).
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Back to State Court by Bruce Edgar Smith. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Attorney Engel) (JLS)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER Received from Smith to Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Summary Report) (JLS)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS filed by All Defendants. (Engel, Joel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint filed in the state court action, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint in Smith v. Brown Case, #3 Exhibit C -Order in Smith v. Brown, #4 Exhibit D - Order of Dismissal Smith v. Kaemingk, #5 Exhibit E - Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary judgment in Smith v. Brown, #6 Exhibit F - Judgment in Smith v. Brown, #7 Exhibit G - Eighth Circuit Judgment in Smith v. Brown, #8 Exhibit H - Order in Smith V. Brown, #9 Exhibit I - Amended Complaint in Smith v. Brown, #10 Exhibit J - Order in Smith v. Brown, #11 Exhibit K - Long v. S.D. D.O.T. Case, #12 Exhibit L - Henderson v. Engstrom, #13 Exhibit M - Bambino v. United States Case) (Engel, Joel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Douglas P. Barnett, Paige Bock, Heather Bowers, Jess Boysen, Kurtis Brown, Keith Ditmanson, Frank Geaghan, William Golden, Justin Kuku, David Lentsch, Eugene Regier, John Shyne, David Stephan, Tammy Sunde, Darin Young. (Engel, Joel)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Douglas P. Barnett, Paige Bock, Heather Bowers, Jess Boysen, Kurtis Brown, Keith Ditmanson, Frank Geaghan, William Golden, Justin Kuku, David Lentsch, Eugene Regier, John Shyne, David Stephan, Tammy Sunde, Darin Young OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Engel, Joel)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 73 memo and AO85 forms. (Attachments: #1 AO85 form)(JLS)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial Circuit, Minnehaha County, State of South Dakota. ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3299717) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Barnett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Boysen
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Bowers
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shyne
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Sunde
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Golden
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stephan
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Young
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Geaghan
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Bock
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ditmanson
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lentsch
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas P. Barnett
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtis Brown
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Regier
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Kuku
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Edgar Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?