Krasniqi v. Holdahl, Inc.
Plaintiff: Visar Krasniqi
Defendant: Holdahl, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04090
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/31/2021 Motions due by 6/30/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on July 13, 2020. (DLC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 Discovery Report Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Holdahl, Inc..(Meshbesher, Brandon)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian A. Wood for Holdahl, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/30/20. (SKK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER by Holdahl, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) (Meshbesher, Brandon)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Brian A. Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3341209) by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice for Removal of Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet and Answer served on Vincent A. Purtell on 6/12/20, filed by Holdahl, Inc.. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/15/2020. (SAC)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Holdahl, Inc.. (FILED IN ERROR: Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service for for Notice of Removal, Answer and Civil Cover Sheet) See Doc. #4 for updated Affidavit (Meshbesher, Brandon) Modified to correct docket text on 6/16/2020 (MSB).
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Visar Krasniqi ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3333515) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasniqi v. Holdahl, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Visar Krasniqi
Represented By: Brandon D. Meshbesher
Represented By: Vincent A. Purtell
Represented By: Shad E. Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holdahl, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon D. Meshbesher
Represented By: Brian A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?