Layton v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Steve Layton and Steve Joe Layton
Defendant: Jennifer Drieske, Darin Young and Alcock
Case Number: 4:2020cv04094
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Requiring Plaintiff to Pay an Initial Partial Filing Fee. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $36.52 is due by 9/11/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/18/2020. (CLR) Modified on 8/18/2020 delivered to Plaintiff and Financial Dept. at SD State Penitentiary via USPS (CLR).
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER Received from Steve Layton to Office of the Clerk. (CLR)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with the filing fee. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (KLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (KLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steve Layton. (KLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Steve Layton. (KLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Donovan Smith re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (KLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Chris Kryger re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (KLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Steve Layton re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (KLE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand ($400 fee paid, receipt# 400052584) filed by Steve Layton. (Attachments: #1 Misc. Attachments, #2 Misc. Attachments) (KLE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2020: #3 Attachment Letter to the Clerk's Office) (KLE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layton v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Joe Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Drieske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?