Tripp v. Dooley et al
Petitioner: Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota, Daren Young, Bob Dooley and Jason Ravnsborg
Case Number: 4:2020cv04095
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLT)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER Received from Kevin Tripp. (SLT)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (SLT)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER Received from Kevin Tripp to Clerk of Courts. (SLT)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy recused. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 6/26/2020. (CG)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.). Copy of docket sheet, motion to proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account form sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SLT)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripp v. Dooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daren Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bob Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?