Dunkelberger v. Young et al
Petitioner: Jason Dunkelberger
Respondent: Darin Young and The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2020cv04117
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF $5 FEE AND THEREAFTER DIRECTING SERVICE AND REQUIRING RSPONSE. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/9/2020. Mailed to Plaintiff via USPS on 9/9/2020(DJP)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (DJP)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 together with a Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Although a new case has been opened, your motion to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (DJP)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Dunkelberger. (DJP)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Jason Dunkelberger. (Attachments: #1 State court documents) (DJP) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2020) (DJP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunkelberger v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Dunkelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?