Warfield v. Mnuchin et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Warfield
Defendant: Charles Retting, United States of America and Steven T. Mnuchin
Case Number: 4:2020cv04121
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 RECEIPT for Certified Mail as to the US Attorney and Attorney General of the United States (SAC)
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 Official Capacity Federal Defendants Service LETTER with enclosed #13 and AO 85 sent by Clerk's Office to Kelly Warfield. (CLR)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Steven T. Mnuchin, Charles Retting, United States of America in their official capacities. Original summons, AO 85, #13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Compel, #1 Complaint delivered via certified mail to each defendant. Delivered copies of summons(es), A0 85, #13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Compel, #1 Complaint to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General via certified mail. (TAL)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 1915A SCREENING ORDER FOR SERVICE IN PART AND DISMISSAL IN PART granting #3 Motion for Service ; denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #8 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/01/2020. MAILED to Kelly Warfield (SAC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly Warfield (SAC)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States of America of Admission of Service of Supplement to Complaint (w attachments). (Ryan, Diana)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Kelly Warfield. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(SAC)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT (missing page) re #6 Supplement by Plaintiff Kelly Warfield. (SAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel by Kelly Warfield. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kelly Warfield. (SAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Kelly Warfield re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Cover Letter) (SAC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2020: #2 Attachment) (SAC).
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SAC)
August 18, 2020 Filing Fee Received from Kelly Warfield. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400052923. (VMM)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. You indicated your payment would be coming from your financial institution, however it has not yet been received. Copy of docket sheet, application to proceed IFP, Prisoner Trust Account Report and civil cover sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SKK)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by Kelly Warfield. (SKK)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kelly Warfield. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (SKK) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2020) (SKK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warfield v. Mnuchin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Warfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Retting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?