Tripp v. Dornbush et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Defendant: Joshua Westencurcher, John Holden, Daren Young, Tye Pingeon, Deseiny Marinouzke, Kayley Armstrong, Ausin Monue, Larry Anderson, Jason Raunsborg, Kyle Bender, Sioux Falls Police Department, Tyler Cook, Savanah Murray, Moses Wagner, Ashley Roopert, Eric Timmerman, Gabrial Stone, James Dornbush, Jessica Cook, Larry Summers, Breana Freeman, Bonnie Templeman, Daniel Armstrong, Jr., Destiny Marinouzue, Jason Ravnsborg and Austin Monue
Case Number: 4:2020cv04125
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot #26 Motion to Dismiss. The court already entered an order of dismissal of this action on October 5, 2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on October 8, 2020. (Schreier, Karen) Modified on 10/9/2020. Sent to Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp via USPS (SKK).
October 8, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to DISMISS by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (SLT)
October 8, 2020 Filing 25 OBJECTION by Plaintiff Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp (SLT)
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 JUDGMENT in favor of Joshua Westencurcher against Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/5/2020. (SLT) Modified on 10/6/2020 Modified on 10/6/2020 delivered to Christopher Tripp via usps with appeal packet (SLT).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/5/2020. (SLT) Modified on 10/6/2020 Modified on 10/6/2020 delivered to Christopher Tripp via usps (SLT).
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER Received from Kevin Tripp to Federal Clerk of Courts. (SLT)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (SLT)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 OBJECTION by Plaintiff Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp (SLT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiff Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp (SLT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 Service LETTER with enclosed Doc. #16 , sample summons and USM 285, blank summons form, blank usm285 form, AO85, rule 73 memo sent by Clerk's Office to Kevin Christopher Michael Tripp. (SLT)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/24/2020. (SLT) Modified on 9/24/2020 mailed to Kevin Tripp and Financial Department of SDSP (SLT).
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTION by Plaintiff Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp (SLT)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (SLT)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLT)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER Received re amendments to 1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) from Kevin Tripp. (SLT)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 WITNESS STATEMENT by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (SLT)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER Received re amendments to 1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) from Kevin Tripp. (SLT)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER re amendments to #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (CLR) Modified on 9/2/2020 to term motion and change event as corrections to spelling of names and jury demand were completed (CLR).
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Shane Bell. (CLR)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Dallas Steiner. (CLR)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Indigency by Kevin Christopher Michael Tripp. (CLR)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (CLR)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (KLE)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (KLE)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (KLE)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand filed by Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripp v. Dornbush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Westencurcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tye Pingeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deseiny Marinouzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayley Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ausin Monue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Raunsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux Falls Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savanah Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Roopert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Timmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrial Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dornbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breana Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Templeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Armstrong, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destiny Marinouzue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Monue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Christopher Micheal Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?