Coon et al v. Ravensborg et al
Plaintiff: Robert J. Power, Eric J. Coon and Eric James Coon
Defendant: Kristi Noem, State of South Dakota and Jason Ravensborg
Case Number: 4:2020cv04132
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A pro se litigant has no statutory or constitutional right to have counsel appointed in a civil case. Stevens v. Redwing, 146 F.3d 538, 546 (8th Cir. 1998). In determining whether to appoint counsel to a pro se litigant, the district court considers the complexity of the case, the ability of the litigant to investigate the facts, the existence of conflicting testimony, and the litigants ability to present his claim. Id. At this point, Coon is able to present his claims, and his claims are not complex. Coons motion to appoint counsel (Docket 5) is denied. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on October 12, 2020. (Schreier, Karen) Modified: mailed to Eric Coon and Robert Power on 10/26/2020 (JLS).
September 18, 2020 Filing Fee Received from Eric James Coon. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX500006422. (SKK)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER Received from Eric J. Coon to Clerk of Courts re: filing fee (DLC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO STATE STATUTE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P 5.1 by Eric James Coon, Robert J. Power. (Attachments: #1 attachments)(DLC)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING FILING FEE OR MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on September 9, 2020. (Sent Order and PTAR, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to Eric James Coon and Robert J. Power via U.S. Postal Service)(DLC) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (DLC).
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with the filing fee. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SAC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eric J. Coon, Robert J. Power. (SAC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Robert J. Power, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B) (SAC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Eric J. Coon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B) (SAC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 BRIEF IN SUPPOSR re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) by Plaintiffs Eric J. Coon, Robert J. Power (SAC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400053029) filed by Eric J. Coon, Robert J. Power. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letters) (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coon et al v. Ravensborg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric J. Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric James Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Noem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ravensborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?