FLANDREAU SANTEE SIOUX TRIBE, a federally recognized Indian tribe v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe
Defendant: RADM Michael D. Weahkee, Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America and David Bernhart
Case Number: 4:2020cv04142
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alex M. Azar, II, David Bernhart, United States of America, Michael D. Weahkee UNOPPOSED. (Roche, Meghan)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brandt B. Fenner for Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on November 4, 2020. (DLC)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Attorney General William Barr on October 2, 2020, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Mailing)(Pearman, Seth)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on RADM Michael D. Weahkee on October 5, 2020, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on David Bernhardt on October 8, 2020, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Alex M. Azar II on October 1, 2020, filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Brandt Benjamin Fenner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3402506) by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pearman, Seth) Modified on 10/23/2020 (JLS).
October 23, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Pearman, Seth)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Roche on behalf of All Defendants. (Roche, Meghan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed United States Attorney - District of South Dakota Acknowledgement filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Pearman, Seth)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney Brandt Benjamin Fenner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3402506) by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pearman, Seth) Modified text on 9/30/2020 (JLS). Modified NFE on 10/23/2020 (JLS).
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Parsons Summons, #2 Barr Summons, #3 Azar Summons, #4 Weahkee Summons, #5 Berhnart Summons, #6 AO 85)(DLC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3402094, in shell case on 09/29/20 filed by Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: #1 2007 Indian Health Manual, Part 6, Chapter 3, #2 Ramah Navajo School Board, Inc. v. Sebelius Memorandum Opinion and Order, #3 September 23 and November 6, 2017 claim letters from Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe to IHS, #4 September 30, 2019 Decision and Counter Claim from IHS to Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe) (DLC) Modified text on 9/30/2020 (JLS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLANDREAU SANTEE SIOUX TRIBE, a federally recognized Indian tribe v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADM Michael D. Weahkee
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhart
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe
Represented By: Seth C. Pearman
Represented By: Brandt B. Fenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?